SD HB1059 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 376
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 376
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding payments of higher education expenses.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding payments of higher education expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-02 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 376 |
2018-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-02 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 8. |
2018-02-02 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1059ja |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-17 | House | Judiciary Deferred to another day, Passed |
2018-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 28 |