SD HB1059 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding vehicle dealer licensing.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding vehicle dealer licensing.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. David Anderson [R] | Sen. Arch Beal [R] | Rep. Ryan Cwach [D] |
Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. Bob Glanzer [R] | Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Rep. Kent Peterson [R] |
Rep. Mark Willadsen [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] |
Sen. Craig Kennedy [D] | Sen. Jack Kolbeck [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Sen. Jim White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 527 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 443 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 389 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 362 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 279 |
2019-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 298 |
2019-01-31 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 278 |
2019-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 146 |