SD HB1061 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a tuition benefit to certain teachers who enroll in courses under the management and control of the Board of Regents that are not subsidized by the general fund.
Title
Provide a tuition benefit to certain teachers who enroll in courses under the management and control of the Board of Regents that are not subsidized by the general fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - Education Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - Education Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 860 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 552 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 525 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 524 |
2016-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 756 |
2016-03-01 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. H.J. 730 |
2016-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | House | Education Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 249 |
2016-02-03 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1061cb |
2016-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 59 |