SD HB1064 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Apply certain penalties regarding damages, tampering, and malicious acts to certain railroads that carry passengers.
Title
Apply certain penalties regarding damages, tampering, and malicious acts to certain railroads that carry passengers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 H.J. 880 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 860 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 547 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 532 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 292 |
2016-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 366 |
2016-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 350 |
2016-02-05 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 301 |
2016-02-05 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1064fa |
2016-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 59 |