SD HB1068 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions relating to the deferral of action by municipalities on committee reports.
Title
Repeal certain provisions relating to the deferral of action by municipalities on committee reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 843 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 837 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 745 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 773 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 672 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 630 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 600 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 576 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 542 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 201 |
2013-01-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 159 |
2013-01-22 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-22 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 127 |
2013-01-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-16 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 81 |