SD HB1070 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2018 H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2018 H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and repeal certain provisions regarding alcoholic beverages.
Title
Revise and repeal certain provisions regarding alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2018 H.J. 740 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2018 H.J. 701 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 704 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 653 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 622 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 579 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 544 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 388 |
2018-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 5. H.J. 338 |
2018-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 322 |
2018-01-31 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 265 |
2018-01-31 | House | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 1070ab |
2018-01-31 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1070aa |
2018-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 30 |