SD HB1072 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Correct a definition in the Uniform Unsworn Domestic Declarations Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correct a definition in the Uniform Unsworn Domestic Declarations Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-19SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 443
2019-02-14SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 389
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-13SenateTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 362
2019-02-13SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 280
2019-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 294
2019-01-31HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 283
2019-01-30HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 245
2019-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 169

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback