SD HB1073 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding the locating and spotting of predators or varmints from a drone.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding the locating and spotting of predators or varmints from a drone.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-22SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 485
2019-02-21SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 460
2019-02-19SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 409 Amendment 1073jta
2019-02-19SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 408
2019-02-14SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 383
2019-02-12SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 341
2019-02-12SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1073ba
2019-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 250
2019-01-30HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 3. H.J. 269
2019-01-30HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 269 Amendment 1073oa
2019-01-29HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 230
2019-01-29HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 170

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1073&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1073P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1073H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1073SAG.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1073S.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1073ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27556&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27673&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28144&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28411&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28593&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback