SD HB1074 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide a privilege for journalists and newscasters regarding refusal to disclose information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide a privilege for journalists and newscasters regarding refusal to disclose information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSigned by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694
2019-03-05SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019 H.J. 626
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the President S.J. 600
2019-02-28SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 593
2019-02-27SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 541
2019-02-26SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 519
2019-02-26SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 350
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 20. H.J. 357
2019-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 346
2019-02-06HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 305
2019-02-06HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1074wb
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 170

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback