SD HB1075 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the authority of conservation district governing boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the authority of conservation district governing boards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSigned by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
2019-02-13SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 386
2019-02-12SenateSigned by the President S.J. 358
2019-02-11SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 363
2019-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 319
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-07SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 298
2019-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 250
2019-01-30HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 270
2019-01-30HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 270 Amendment 1075ca
2019-01-29HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 231
2019-01-29HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseReferred to House Local Government, Passed H.J. 185
2019-01-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 170

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback