SD HB1076 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-4)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-4)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain real estate licensee advertising restrictions and grant rule-making authority regarding real estate teams.
Title
Revise certain real estate licensee advertising restrictions and grant rule-making authority regarding real estate teams.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Chase [R] | Rep. David Anderson [R] | Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Rep. Doug Barthel [R] |
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Caleb Finck [R] | Rep. Bob Glanzer [R] | Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] |
Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Sen. John Lake [R] | Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] |
Rep. Steven McCleerey [D] | Sen. Herman Otten [R] | Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] |
Rep. Ray Ring [D] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] | Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] |
Rep. Nancy York [R] | Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] |
Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] |
Sen. Lance Russell [R] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] | Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R] |
Sen. Jim White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 04, 2019 H.J. 596 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 556 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 579 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 524 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 512 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 467 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 280 |
2019-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 9. H.J. 295 |
2019-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 283 |
2019-01-30 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 246 |
2019-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 170 |