SD HB1079 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allow a person to perform plumbing work on the person's own property without a license and establish a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow a person to perform plumbing work on the person's own property without a license and establish a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-20SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 454
2019-02-19SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 407
2019-02-13SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 378
2019-02-13SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-07SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 302
2019-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 309
2019-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 308 Amendment 1079yc
2019-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 294
2019-01-30HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 246
2019-01-30HouseCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1079yb
2019-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 171

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback