SD HB1080 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-11)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increase the property tax exemption allowed for certain veterans with a disability and the surviving spouses of certain veterans with a disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase the property tax exemption allowed for certain veterans with a disability and the surviving spouses of certain veterans with a disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
2019-03-06SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 06, 2019 H.J. 650
2019-03-05SenateSigned by the President S.J. 618
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 551
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-27SenateTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 532
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 475
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 466
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453
2019-02-13HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 405
2019-02-13HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1080ca
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 171

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback