SD HB1082 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To revise certain provisions regarding scrap metal purchases.
Title
To revise certain provisions regarding scrap metal purchases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 527 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 485 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 461 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 414 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 264 |
2019-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 283 |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 246 |
2019-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 188 |