SD HB1083 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding permits to carry a concealed pistol and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding permits to carry a concealed pistol and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 777 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 H.J. 778 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 720 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 1. S.J. 696 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Title amended, Passed S.J. 629 Amendment 1083kta |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1083kd |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 367 |
2018-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 315 |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-31 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 241 |
2018-01-31 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1083ka |
2018-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-16 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 65 |