SD HB1084 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for specific classification of affordable housing structures for purposes of taxation.
Title
Provide for specific classification of affordable housing structures for purposes of taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Arch Beal [R] | Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] | Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] | Rep. Jon Hansen [R] |
Rep. Chris Karr [R] | Rep. Sam Marty [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] |
Rep. Gary Cammack [R] | Sen. Kris Langer [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 38 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 38 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 681 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 710 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 649 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 624 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 520 |
2019-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 38, NAYS 29. H.J. 534 |
2019-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 534 Amendment 1084wb |
2019-02-22 | House | Commerce and Energy Title amended, Passed H.J. 477 Amendment 1084wta |
2019-02-22 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 2. |
2019-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy, Passed H.J. 450 |
2019-02-20 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1084wa |
2019-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 188 |