SD HB1088 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a penalty for violation of a vulnerable adult protection order and to revise certain provisions regarding protection orders.
Title
Create a penalty for violation of a vulnerable adult protection order and to revise certain provisions regarding protection orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 H.J. 629 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 620 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 H.J. 618 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 541 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 582 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 455 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1088E |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-03-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 385 |
2020-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 429 |
2020-02-26 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-26 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1088C |
2020-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 63 |