SD HB1091 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 466
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the selection of a lieutenant governor by a candidate for governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the selection of a lieutenant governor by a candidate for governor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22SenateState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 466
2019-02-22SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1091ca
2019-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 367
2019-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 16. H.J. 382
2019-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 381 Amendment 1091oa
2019-02-11HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 350
2019-02-11HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 190

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback