SD HB1095 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 H.J. 682
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding resident fishing possession limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding resident fishing possession limits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to another day (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07SenateSigned by the Governor on March 6, 2017 H.J. 682
2017-03-01SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 01, 2017 H.J. 596
2017-02-28SenateSigned by the President S.J. 591
2017-02-27SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 560
2017-02-24SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 2. H.J. 532
2017-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 500
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2017-02-16SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 409
2017-02-16SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. Amendment 1095ka
2017-02-16SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-02-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 342
2017-02-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 332
2017-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 314
2017-02-02HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 266
2017-02-02HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1095jd
2017-02-02HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1095jc
2017-02-02HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1095jb
2017-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-01-31HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
2017-01-31HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1095ja
2017-01-31HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 192

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1095&Session=2017
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/HB1095P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/HB1095HAG.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/HB1095SAG.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/HB1095ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=22673&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=22767&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=22988&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23396&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23398&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23554&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23725&Session=2017&Session=2017

Bill Comments

feedback