SD HB1096 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specify the venue for certain appeals involving home-rule municipalities.
Title
Specify the venue for certain appeals involving home-rule municipalities.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Abdallah [R] | Sen. Angie Buhl [D] | Sen. Joni Cutler [R] | Rep. Bob Deelstra [R] |
Rep. Marc Feinstein [D] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Rep. Roger Hunt [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] |
Sen. David Novstrup [R] | Rep. Tad Perry [R] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor H.J. 734 | |
2012-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 717 | |
2012-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 647 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 681 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 596 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 553 | |
2012-02-24 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1096ta | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | Re-referred to Senate Local Government, Passed S.J. 436 | |
2012-01-30 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 214 | |
2012-01-26 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 230 | |
2012-01-25 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 192 | |
2012-01-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-20 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 70 |