SD HB1098 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding publication of official ballots in a legal newspaper.
Title
Revise provisions regarding publication of official ballots in a legal newspaper.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 403 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 373 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 382 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 332 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 310 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 263 |
2019-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 282 |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 244 |
2019-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 191 |