SD HB1099 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the designation of a caregiver to receive information regarding residents of treatment facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the designation of a caregiver to receive information regarding residents of treatment facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
2019-03-13SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019 H.J. 755
2019-03-12SenateSigned by the President S.J. 716
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 713
2019-03-11SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 707
2019-03-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 634
2019-03-04SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 586
2019-03-04SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1099oa
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-07SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 302
2019-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 309
2019-02-05HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 289
2019-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 191

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1099&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1099P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1099SHE.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1099ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27754&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27862&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29072&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29262&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29364&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback