SD HB1108 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 466
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit certain gender dysphoria instruction in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit certain gender dysphoria instruction in public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 39 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22SenateState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 466
2019-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 367
2019-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 374 Amendment 1108cta
2019-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 39, NAYS 30. H.J. 374
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363
2019-02-06HouseEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 6. H.J. 322
2019-02-06HouseEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1108ca
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 193

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback