SD HB1110 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for openness in certain electronic records databases and to open certain information regarding electronic record systems.
Title
Provide for openness in certain electronic records databases and to open certain information regarding electronic record systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 842 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 735 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 581 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-25 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 557 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 224 |
2013-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 174 |
2013-01-23 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 146 |
2013-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 112 |