SD HB1110 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the penalty for certain subsequent convictions of hiring for sexual activity or promoting prostitution.
Title
Increase the penalty for certain subsequent convictions of hiring for sexual activity or promoting prostitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2018 H.J. 747 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 749 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 674 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 628 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 351 |
2018-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 295 |
2018-01-31 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 241 |
2018-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 114 |