SD HB1110 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish a penalty for certain persons who fail to file a birth certificate or who fail to provide the notice required for the filing of a death certificate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish a penalty for certain persons who fail to file a birth certificate or who fail to provide the notice required for the filing of a death certificate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 681
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 710
2019-03-07SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 677
2019-03-05SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 608
2019-02-28SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-28SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 547
2019-02-28SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1110ka
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 280
2019-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 296
2019-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 296 Amendment 1110wb
2019-01-30HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 245
2019-01-30HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1110wa
2019-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 194

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1110&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1110P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1110HJU.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1110H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1110SJU.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1110ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27642&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27794&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28992&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29163&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29295&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback