SD HB1113 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to fund tax refunds for elderly persons and persons with a disability and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to fund tax refunds for elderly persons and persons with a disability and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 773 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 648 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 732 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 680 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 559 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 507 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1113da |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 241 |
2014-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 300 |
2014-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 285 |
2014-01-31 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 243 |
2014-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 118 |