SD HB1116 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding special interest motor vehicle license plates.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding special interest motor vehicle license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Transportation Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Transportation Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Transportation Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Transportation Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2018 H.J. 747 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 749 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 0. H.J. 662 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 617 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 576 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1116cb |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 331 |
2018-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 259 |
2018-01-25 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 192 |
2018-01-25 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. Amendment 1116oa |
2018-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 128 |