SD HB1117 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establish immunity from liability for injuries to or the death of a person engaged in off-road vehicle activity under certain circumstances.
Title
Establish immunity from liability for injuries to or the death of a person engaged in off-road vehicle activity under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 445 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 388 |
2019-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 397 |
2019-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 397 Amendment 1117ca |
2019-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 382 |
2019-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363 |
2019-02-08 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 339 |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 195 |