SD HB1117 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal and revise certain provisions regarding riot, to establish the crime of incitement to riot, and to revise provisions regarding civil liability for riot and riot boosting.
Title
Repeal and revise certain provisions regarding riot, to establish the crime of incitement to riot, and to revise provisions regarding civil liability for riot and riot boosting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 H.J. 629 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 552 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 535 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 440 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 256 |
2020-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 45, NAYS 25. H.J. 302 |
2020-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 283 |
2020-02-12 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. |
2020-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 107 |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading House H.J. 83 |