SD HB1118 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify certain provisions about discharging firearms in safety zones.
Title
Clarify certain provisions about discharging firearms in safety zones.
Sponsors
Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Christine Erickson [R] | Rep. Peggy Gibson [D] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] |
Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] | Rep. Elizabeth May [R] |
Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. Tim Begalka [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Chuck Jones [R] |
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 749 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 629 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 672 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 553 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 529 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 225 |
2014-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 278 |
2014-01-31 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-01-31 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 243 |
2014-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 119 |