SD HB1118 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-3)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-3)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for oversight of postsecondary technical institutes.
Title
Provide for oversight of postsecondary technical institutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 768 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 729 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 658 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 670 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 625 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 594 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 446 |
2015-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 434 |
2015-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 416 |
2015-02-11 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 378 |
2015-02-11 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1118sb |
2015-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-06 | House | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2015-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 179 |