SD HB1118 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limit the amount of instructional time that may be spent administering statewide academic assessments.
Title
Limit the amount of instructional time that may be spent administering statewide academic assessments.
Sponsors
Rep. Jacqueline Sly [R] | Rep. Peggy Gibson [D] | Rep. Paula Hawks [D] | Rep. Tom Holmes [R] |
Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Sen. Joshua Klumb [R] | Rep. Burt Tulson [R] | Sen. Deb Soholt [R] |
Sen. Angie Buhl [D] | Sen. Richard Curd [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] |
Sen. Billie Sutton [D] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 H.J. 881 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 860 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 549 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 521 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 322 |
2016-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 399 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-10 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 355 |
2016-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 196 |