SD HB1120 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow regional intergovernmental cooperation for sewer utilities and to provide for the establishment of rates and charges.
Title
Allow regional intergovernmental cooperation for sewer utilities and to provide for the establishment of rates and charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 842 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 772 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 688 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 627 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 592 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 327 |
2013-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 291 |
2013-01-31 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 269 |
2013-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 130 |