SD HB1121 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal certain provisions regarding health inspections of food service establishments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal certain provisions regarding health inspections of food service establishments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSigned by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
2019-02-14SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 403
2019-02-13SenateSigned by the President S.J. 373
2019-02-12SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 382
2019-02-11SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 332
2019-02-08SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-08SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 310
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-05SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 264
2019-01-31HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 283
2019-01-30HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-30HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 246
2019-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 196

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback