SD HB1122 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-22)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - No motion to reconsider H.J. 366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - No motion to reconsider H.J. 366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate money for the Northern Crops Institute.
Title
Appropriate money for the Northern Crops Institute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 41 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | No motion to reconsider H.J. 366 | |
2010-02-10 | Intent to reconsider H.J. 357 | |
2010-02-10 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 41, NAYS 25. H.J. 357 | |
2010-02-09 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 340 | |
2010-02-04 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. H.J. 308 | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 170 |