SD HB1122 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Define the limitations of interstate compacts relating to the collection of civil fines.
Title
Define the limitations of interstate compacts relating to the collection of civil fines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 780 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 673 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 773 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 744 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 612 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 1122ytb |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 570 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1122yb |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 406 |
2014-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 472 |
2014-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 472 Amendment 1122ya |
2014-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 455 |
2014-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 441 |
2014-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 416 |
2014-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 407 |
2014-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 382 |
2014-02-10 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 348 |
2014-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 120 |