SD HB1122 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 H.J. 682
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 H.J. 682
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify certain provisions regarding the process to be excused from public school attendance.
Title
Clarify certain provisions regarding the process to be excused from public school attendance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 H.J. 682 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2017 H.J. 596 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 560 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 558 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 515 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 343 |
2017-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 326 |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-06 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 304 |
2017-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 215 |