SD HB1122 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise references to persons who are deaf or hard of hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise references to persons who are deaf or hard of hearing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
2019-03-06SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 06, 2019 H.J. 650
2019-03-05SenateSigned by the President S.J. 618
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 551
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-27SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 532
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 429
2019-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 8. H.J. 433
2019-02-13HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 407
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 196

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback