SD HB1124 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 62-13)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Require health care facilities that perform mammography to inform mammography patients on breast density.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require health care facilities that perform mammography to inform mammography patients on breast density.

Sponsors

Rep. Taffy Howard [R]Rep. Hugh Bartels [R]Rep. Arch Beal [R]Rep. Scyller Borglum [R]
Rep. Thomas Brunner [R]Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R]Rep. Roger Chase [R]Rep. Michael Diedrich [R]
Rep. Linda Duba [D]Rep. Mary Duvall [R]Rep. Caleb Finck [R]Rep. Julie Frye-mueller [R]
Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R]Rep. Brian Gosch [R]Rep. Lana Greenfield [R]Rep. Randy Gross [R]
Rep. Jon Hansen [R]Rep. Steven Haugaard [R]Rep. Erin Healy [D]Rep. Jean Hunhoff [R]
Rep. Timothy Johns [R]Rep. Chris Johnson [R]Rep. Chris Karr [R]Rep. Lance Koth [R]
Rep. John Lake [R]Rep. Isaac Latterell [R]Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D]Rep. Steve Livermont [R]
Rep. John Mills [R]Rep. Rhonda Milstead [R]Rep. Tina Mulally [R]Rep. Herman Otten [R]
Rep. Carl Perry [R]Rep. Kent Peterson [R]Rep. Tom Pischke [R]Rep. Doug Post [R]
Rep. Peri Pourier [D]Rep. Lee Qualm [R]Rep. Tony Randolph [R]Rep. Nancy Rasmussen [R]
Rep. Tim Reed [R]Rep. Rebecca Reimer [R]Rep. Ray Ring [D]Rep. Tim Rounds [R]
Rep. Michael Saba [D]Rep. Kyle Schoenfish [R]Rep. Jamie Smith [D]Rep. Tamara St John [R]
Rep. Manny Steele [R]Rep. Kelly Sullivan [D]Rep. Marli Wiese [R]Rep. Mark Willadsen [R]
Rep. Nancy York [R]Sen. Deb Soholt [R]Sen. Rocky Blare [R]Sen. Lynn Disanto [R]
Sen. Brock Greenfield [R]Sen. Troy Heinert [D]Sen. Phil Jensen [R]Sen. Craig Kennedy [D]
Sen. Jack Kolbeck [R]Sen. Kris Langer [R]Sen. Stace Nelson [R]Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D]
Sen. Ernie Otten [R]Sen. Arthur Rusch [R]Sen. Lance Russell [R]Sen. Alan Solano [R]
Sen. Jim Stalzer [R]Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R]Sen. Billie Sutton [D]Sen. Jim White [R]
Sen. John Wiik [R]Sen. Susan Wismer [D]Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R]

Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-19SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 443
2019-02-14SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 389
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-13SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 363
2019-02-13SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 280
2019-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 298
2019-01-31HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 276
2019-01-31HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 197

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback