SD HB1127 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide an exemption for alimony payments in debtor filings.
Title
Provide an exemption for alimony payments in debtor filings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 773 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 653 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 750 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 6. H.J. 710 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 598 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 598 Amendment 1127jh |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 570 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-20 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 383 |
2014-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 12. H.J. 451 |
2014-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 451 Amendment 1127jg |
2014-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 441 |
2014-02-12 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 390 |
2014-02-12 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. Amendment 1127je |
2014-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-07 | House | Judiciary Deferred to another day, Passed |
2014-02-07 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1127ja |
2014-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 121 |