SD HB1127 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the calculation of fall enrollment for the purposes of education funding.
Title
Revise the calculation of fall enrollment for the purposes of education funding.
Sponsors
Sen. John Lake [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 446 |
2019-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 394 |
2019-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 382 |
2019-02-11 | House | Fiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 356 |
2019-02-08 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 338 |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 198 |