SD HB1129 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 60-17)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 60-17)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the use of certain explosive targets in the Black Hills Forest Fire Protection District.
Title
Prohibit the use of certain explosive targets in the Black Hills Forest Fire Protection District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 773 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 653 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 750 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 717 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 602 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 602 Amendment 1129rb |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 575 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 562 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 529 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 453 |
2014-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 13. H.J. 511 |
2014-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 493 |
2014-02-19 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 447 |
2014-02-19 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1129jb |
2014-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 121 |