SD HB1133 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 735
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 735
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the Legislature's Planning Committee.
Title
Establish the Legislature's Planning Committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Rep. Mitchell Fargen [D] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] |
Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Nick Moser [R] |
Sen. Russell Olson [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor H.J. 735 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by President S.J. 629 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 14. S.J. 601 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 587 | |
2012-02-24 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 554 | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 438 | |
2012-02-14 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 18. H.J. 461 | |
2012-02-14 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 461 Amendment 1133rb | |
2012-02-14 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 460 Amendment 1133ja | |
2012-02-08 | Fiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 361 | |
2012-02-08 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 361 Amendment 1133oa | |
2012-02-08 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 361 Amendment 1133ra | |
2012-02-07 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 342 | |
2012-02-06 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 310 | |
2012-02-06 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 146 |