SD HB1137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding pharmacy benefit managers.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding pharmacy benefit managers.
Sponsors
Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] | Rep. David Anderson [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Sen. John Lake [R] |
Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] |
Sen. VJ Smith [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 H.J. 694 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 04, 2019 H.J. 596 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 556 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 558 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 501 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 466 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 350 |
2019-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 361 |
2019-02-07 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 318 |
2019-02-07 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1137cb |
2019-02-07 | House | Health and Human Services Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1137kb |
2019-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 199 |