SD HB1139 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the applicability of adverse possession to certain partition fences.
Title
Revise the applicability of adverse possession to certain partition fences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 796 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 777 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 H.J. 778 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 721 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 21, NAYS 12. S.J. 697 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 632 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1139kb |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 447 |
2018-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 2. H.J. 412 |
2018-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 411 Amendment 1139jb |
2018-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 391 |
2018-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 373 |
2018-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 362 |
2018-02-02 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 309 |
2018-02-02 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1139ka |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 150 |