SD HB1139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 31. H.J. 448
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 31. H.J. 448
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal provisions regarding maximum taxes levied by a school district for capital outlay.
Title
Repeal provisions regarding maximum taxes levied by a school district for capital outlay.
Sponsors
Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] | Rep. Lana Greenfield [R] | Sen. John Lake [R] | Rep. Steve Livermont [R] |
Rep. Sam Marty [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] | Rep. Kaleb Weis [R] |
Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 31. H.J. 448 |
2019-02-19 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 436 |
2019-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 33, NAYS 35. H.J. 435 |
2019-02-13 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 3. H.J. 386 |
2019-02-13 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1139wa |
2019-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 200 |