SD HB1140 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the crimes and lookback period to enhance the penalty for violating a protection order.
Title
Increase the crimes and lookback period to enhance the penalty for violating a protection order.
Sponsors
Rep. Peggy Gibson [D] | Rep. Paula Hawks [D] | Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] | Sen. Angie Buhl [D] |
Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House of Representatives Failed to concur (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House of Representatives Failed to concur (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 800 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 784 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 726 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 770 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 759 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 745 Amendment cc1140a |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 704 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 695 Amendment Cc1140a |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 723 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 12. H.J. 718 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 677 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 639 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 595 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1140rb |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 528 |
2015-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 15. H.J. 524 |
2015-02-20 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 468 |
2015-02-20 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1140ra |
2015-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 200 |