SD HB1140 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a regular review of parenting guidelines.
Title
Provide for a regular review of parenting guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 H.J. 629 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 491 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 2. H.J. 545 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 455 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1140B |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 355 |
2020-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 386 |
2020-02-21 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-21 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-21 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1140A |
2020-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 105 |