SD HB1143 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding contribution limits to political action committees.
Title
Revise provisions regarding contribution limits to political action committees.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Sen. Michael Diedrich [R] | Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] | Rep. Jon Hansen [R] |
Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Sen. Kris Langer [R] | Rep. Gary Cammack [R] |
Sen. Joshua Klumb [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 527 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 485 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 458 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 425 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 350 |
2019-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 356 |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-08 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 337 |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 218 |
2019-01-25 | House | First Reading House H.J. 201 |